Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5204.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|