California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1588 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016
Bill March 9, 2016
Bill February 29, 2016