Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2016 | Read first time. To print. |