California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1603 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 27, 2016

Amended

Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016