Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ting.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4377.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 15). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4327.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4575.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|