Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ting.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 27). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4539.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4546.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4410.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4575.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|