Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4578.) | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2016 | Read first time. To print. |