Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 4564.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|