Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2016 | Read first time. To print. |