|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 5243.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 20. Page 5078.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|