07/22/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/22/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4649.). | ||
Senate | 06/27/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4359.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |