Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |