Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2016 | Read first time. To print. |