|
08/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 242, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4951.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4777.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|