Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2016 | Read first time. To print. |