|
08/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 211, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1875.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1222.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|