California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1666 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2016

Amended

Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016