|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 874, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6117.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5023.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 4673.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4567.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|