|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6569.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6574.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5557.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5578.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5510.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5014.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|