Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4629.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 33. Page 5134.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|