California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1676 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016