LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1677
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1677
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1677
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 19, 2016
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 17, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 27, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 31, 2016
Compare
Bill
April 20, 2016
Compare