|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 875, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6158.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5117.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4360.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|