|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4717.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4674.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|