Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Held without recommendation. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2016 | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2016 | Read first time. To print. |