California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1682 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 10, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill February 29, 2016