Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2016 | Read first time. To print. |