|
08/17/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4722.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4785.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|