|
07/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 46, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 4547.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 4898.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|