California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1696 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1696CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 606 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 25, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 16, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 7, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Holden (Coauthor: Assembly Member Wood) JANUARY 21, 2016 An act to add Section 14134.25 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1696, Holden. Medi-Cal: tobacco cessation services. Existing law provides for the Medi-Cal program, administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, under which basic health care services are provided to qualified low-income persons. The Medi-Cal program is, in part, governed and funded by federal Medicaid provisions. Existing law provides for a schedule of benefits under the Medi-Cal program. Existing law requires that preventive services assigned a grade of A or B by the United States Preventive Services Task Force be provided to Medi-Cal beneficiaries without any cost sharing by the beneficiary in order for the state to receive increased federal contributions for those services, as specified. This bill would provide that, only to the extent that federal financial participation is available and not otherwise jeopardized, and any necessary federal approvals have been obtained, tobacco cessation services are covered benefits, subject to utilization controls, under the Medi-Cal program and would require those services to include all intervention recommendations, as periodically updated, assigned a grade A or B by the United States Preventive Services Task Force, and include quit attempts based upon medical necessity, as specified. The bill also would require, only to the extent consistent with the recommendations of the United States Preventive Services Task Force, tobacco cessation services to include at least 4 counseling sessions per quit attempt and a treatment regimen of any medication approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration and that is a covered Medi-Cal benefit for tobacco cessation. The bill would require the department to seek any federal approvals necessary to implement its provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14134.25 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 14134.25. (a) Tobacco cessation services are covered benefits under the Medi-Cal program, subject to utilization controls. Tobacco cessation services shall include all intervention recommendations, as periodically updated, assigned a grade A or B by the United States Preventive Services Task Force. Tobacco cessation services shall include quit attempts based on medical necessity, as defined in Section 14059.5, and consistent with United States Preventive Services Task Force grade A and B recommendations, with no required break between attempts, for all beneficiaries 18 years of age and older who use tobacco. For beneficiaries under 18 years of age, tobacco cessation services shall be provided in accordance with both the American Academy of Pediatrics Bright Futures periodicity schedule and anticipatory guidance as periodically updated, as well as services assigned a grade A or B by the United States Preventive Services Task Force. (b) For purposes of this section, in addition to the services described in subdivision (a) and only to the extent consistent with the intervention recommendations, as periodically updated, assigned a grade A or B by the United States Preventive Services Task Force, tobacco cessation services for beneficiaries 18 years of age and older shall include: (1) At least four tobacco cessation counseling sessions per quit attempt that may be conducted in person or by telephone and individually or as part of a group, at the beneficiary's option. (2) (A) A tobacco cessation treatment regimen of any medication approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration, and that is a covered Medi-Cal benefit, for tobacco cessation, including prescription and over-the-counter medications, in accordance with United States Preventive Services Task Force grade A and B recommendations. (B) A prescription from a provider with authority to prescribe and proof of Medi-Cal coverage shall be sufficient documentation to fill a prescription for over-the-counter tobacco cessation medications. (c) Beneficiaries who are covered under this section shall not be required to receive a particular form of tobacco cessation service as a condition of receiving any other form of tobacco cessation service. (d) Effective January 1, 2017, the department shall seek any federal approvals necessary to implement this section that the department determines are necessary to implement this section. (e) This section shall be implemented only to the extent that federal financial participation is available and not otherwise jeopardized, and any necessary federal approvals have been obtained.