LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1696
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1696
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1696
Compare Versions
AB1696 Chaptered September 25, 2016
AB1696 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1696 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1696 Amended June 27, 2016
AB1696 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1696 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1696 Amended March 7, 2016
AB1696 Introduced January 21, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1696 Chaptered September 25, 2016
AB1696 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1696 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1696 Amended June 27, 2016
AB1696 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1696 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1696 Amended March 7, 2016
AB1696 Introduced January 21, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare