|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6158.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5118.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5021.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|