LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1698
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1698
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1698
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
04/07/2016
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/04/2016
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
02/18/2016
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
Assembly
01/26/2016
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
Assembly
01/25/2016
Read first time. To print.