Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|