Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 1854.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|