07/22/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/22/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4648.). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3979.) | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 8). | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2016 | Read first time. To print. |