Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4360.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|