LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1708
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1708
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1708
Compare Versions
AB1708 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1708 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1708 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1708 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1708 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1708 Amended May 5, 2016
AB1708 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1708 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1708 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1708 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1708 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1708 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1708 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1708 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1708 Amended May 5, 2016
AB1708 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1708 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1708 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare