Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Block.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Nielsen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1794.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|