California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016