Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2016 | Read first time. To print. |