Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 5129.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|