California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016