California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016