LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1724
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1724
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1724
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
03/29/2016
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
02/25/2016
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Assembly
01/29/2016
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
Assembly
01/28/2016
Read first time. To print.