Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2016 | Read first time. To print. |