California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016