Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Read first time. To print. |