|
08/17/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5636.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4646.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3912.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|