Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2016 | Read first time. To print. |